### Vedic Math - Base Multiplication Part-2

Note: Vedic Math Blog has been moved to http://vedicmath.vedantatree.com/. Please bookmark the new address for new and existing blogs.

In the previous article, we learnt multiplication by taking base. We discussed following three cases:
A. Numbers are below the base number
B. Numbers are above the base number
C. One number is above the base and the other number is below it

And now, we shall discuss rest of the two cases here:
D. Numbers are not near the base number, but are near a multiple of the base number, like 20, 30, 50 , 250 , 600 etc.
E. Numbers near different bases like multiplier is near to different base and multiplicand is near to different base.

Before going further, let us take few examples of larger numbers with the same method, which we have discussed in previous article.

Example: 6848 x 9997

6848    -3152
9997    -0003
----------------
6845  |  9456     (Refer to previous article for details of approach)
----------------

Example: 87654 x 99995

Let us discuss the fourth case:
D. Numbers are not near the base number, but are near a multiple of the base number, like 20, 30, 50 , 250 , 600 etc.

As you know that this method is applicable in all the cases, but works best when numbers are close to the base. Here, we shall apply the same sutras  “All from 9 and the last from 10” and "Vertically and Crosswise"  discussed earlier and also the sub sutra i.e. "Proportionately".

Take example as 207 x 213 . Here the numbers are not near to any of the bases that we used before: 10, 100, 1000 etc. But these are close to '200'. So, when neither the multiplicand nor the multiplier is near to the convenient power of 10 then we can take a convenient multiple or sub-multiple of a suitable base (as our 'Working Base'). And then perform the necessary operation by multiply or divide the result proportionately. Like in this example, we take 100 as a 'theoretical base' and take multiple of 100 i.e. 200 (100 x 2) as our 'working base'.

207 x 213
207    +007
213    +013
------------
= 220  |  091
------------
= (220 x 200) | 91
= 44000 + 91
44091

As they are close to 200, therefore deviations are 7 and 13 as shown above. From the usual procedure (refer to previous article), we get, 220 | 91. Now since our base is 200, we multiply the left-hand part of the answer by 200 and add it to the right-hand part. That is, (220 x200) + 91 {(Left side x base) + right side}. The final answer is '44091'.