Vedic Math - Multiplication of numbers whose last digits add to 10 and first digits are same and vice-versa.

Note: Vedic Math Blog has been moved to http://vedicmath.vedantatree.com/. Please bookmark the new address for new and existing blogs.

We had discussed this method in our previous articles for 2-digit numbers and today we shall explain the same method for 3-digit numbers.

A. Numbers whose last digits add to 10 and the remaining first digits are the same
Case 1: When sum of last two digits number is 100
Example: 392 x 308
Here we can see that right digits sum is 100 i.e.(92 + 8) and left side digits are same. Here we can now apply the same method, which we discussed earlier for 2-digit number. But this time we must expect to have four figures on the right-hand side.

• First, multiply the right side numbers(92 x 08) and the result is 0736.
• Second, multiply 3 by the number that follows it, i.e.4, so the result of (3 x 4) is 12.
• And now the final output is 120736.

Example: 795 x 705
Here 95 + 05 = 100 and left side digits are same i.e. '7'. Hence it qualifies for this case.
In calculation, we shall multiple the last two digits and the left digit i.e. '7; with its next number '8'. So the calculation is:
795 x 705 = 7 x 8 | 95 x 05
= 56 | 0475
= 560475

Example: 866 X 834
Here 66 + 34 = 100 and left side digit is 8 and its next number is 9. So the calculation is:
848 x 852 = 8 x 9 | 66 x 34            (Note: For 66 x 34, we shall discuss in our upcoming articles)
= 72 | 2244
= 722244

Case 2: When sum of whose last digits is 10  and the remaining first digits are the same
Example: 241 x 249
Here we can see that right digits sum is 10 i.e.(9 + 1) and left side digits are same i.e. 24. So we can now apply the same method as described above.
241 x 249 = 24 x 25 | 1 x 9
= 0600 | 09
= 60009